+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-129).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-129).
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-129) READ and ADOPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
- Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter 126 - 30-A section 3972, sub-section 1, paragraph B
- Chapter 126 - 30-A section 3972, sub-section 2, paragraph C
- Chapter 126 - 30-A section 3972, sub-section 2, paragraph D
- Chapter 126 - 30-A section 3972, sub-section 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor