+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- PREVAILED
- (20 -Yeas, 15 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- Roll Call Number 29
- On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered)
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, in concurrence.
- Senator HASKELL of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, in concurrence.
- Reports READ.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative GOODE of Bangor TABLED pending the motion of Representative TIPPING-SPITZ of Orono to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered)
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
- ROLL CALL NO. 14
- (Yeas 101 - Nays 43 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered)
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham TABLED pending the motion of Representative TIPPING-SPITZ of Orono to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Representative TIPPING-SPITZ of Orono moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Reports READ.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Haskell of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION, in concurrence.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
- Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 3, 2013: ACCEPT MAJ ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 15
March 28, 2013: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 43
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor