+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-626) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-626) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 390 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator SANBORN of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Reports READ
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- (Yeas 81 - Nays 58 - Absent 12 - Excused 0)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 298
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-626) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-626).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 15, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On May 18, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
- Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter 391 - 24-A section 7503
- Chapter 391 - 24-A section 7502
- Chapter 391 - 24-A section 7501
- Chapter 391 - 5 section 12004-G, sub-section 14-J
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
June 15, 2021: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 58
- Absent: 12