+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Referendum Vote (Governor's Signature Not Required.)
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate ADHERED to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE Bill and accompanying papers In NON-CONCURRENCE
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 87 Yeas 19 - Nays 15 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Taken from the table by the President
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
- Speaker laid before the House
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending REFERENCE.
- Transmitted to the Clerk of the 128th Maine Legislature by the Secretary of State on March 13, 2017 and ordered printed.
+ − Vote
April 20, 2017: INDEFINITELY POSTPONE
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1