+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 129 - Nays 9 - Absent 13 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 507
- Subsequently, FINALLY PASSED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered)
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-610) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-610), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-610)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, in concurrence.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 27, 2014: Final Passage
- Yeas: 129
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 13