+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-295) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-295), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-295).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- Chapter null - 5 section 20067, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 5 section 20065
- Chapter null - 5 section 20067, sub-section 4
- Chapter 432 - 5 section 20067, sub-section 3
- Chapter 432 - 5 section 20065
- Chapter 432 - 5 section 20067, sub-section 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor