+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report , in concurrence.
- Reports READ
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative GIDEON of Freeport, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Burns of Washington REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES.
- Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed.