+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
- LD 1005 In Senate, June 30, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 31 In Favor and 3 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 128 having voted in the affirmative and 18 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 430V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED , in concurrence.
- READ ONCE
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED , in concurrence.
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Burns of Washington, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 285 - 22 section 3023, paragraph 1
+ − Votes (2)
June 30, 2015: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 128
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 5
June 30, 2015: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1