+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 340
- (Yeas 79 - Nays 64 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-322)
- Sent down for concurrence
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker FECTEAU of Biddeford MOVED to INSIST.
- Motion of Representative DILLINGHAM of Oxford to RECEDE and CONCUR
- to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-322) FAILED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 372
- (Yeas 59 - Nays 75 - Absent 17 - Excused 0)
- Subsequently, The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 401 Yeas 16 - Nays 19 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- Reports READ
- On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED
- Sent down for concurrence
- Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-322) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-322)
On June 15, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP/OTP-AM
On May 20, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On April 21, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter null - 14 section 164-C
+ − Votes (3)
June 17, 2021: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 75
- Absent: 17
June 16, 2021: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 64
- Absent: 8
June 16, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 19
+ − Sponsors (3)
Jeffrey TIMBERLAKE
Type:
Primary Sponsor