+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) was ADOPTED
- On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE
- Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-557)
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-353) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) READ and ADOPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-353) thereto ADOPTED
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-353) In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Sent down for concurrence
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-353) thereto.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-557).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-557), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.