+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-122) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-122) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 70 Yeas 23 - Nays 10 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Taken from the table by the President
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator MILLETT of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence.
- Reports READ
- On motion by Senator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence.
- Unfinished Business
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-122).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-122) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- (Yeas 88 - Nays 49 - Absent 12 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
- ROLL CALL NO. 54
- On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter null - 20-A section 4013
- Chapter null - 20-A section 12
- Chapter 123 - 20-A section 4013
- Chapter 123 - 20-A section 12
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2019: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
April 23, 2019: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 49
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor