+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence.
- Reports READ
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 80 - Nays 57 - Absent 14 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 592
- Subsequently, on motion of Representative GOODE of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Reports READ.
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Haskell of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION, in concurrence.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
- Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 28, 2014: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 57
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor