+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-185) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-185), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-185).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
- Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter null - 12 section 11154, sub-section 7-A
- Chapter null - 12 section 11154, sub-section 15
- Chapter 143 - 12 section 11154, sub-section 7-A
- Chapter 143 - 12 section 11154, sub-section 15
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor