+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 248 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
- Reports Read
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 79 - Nays 62 - Absent 10 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 164
- On motion of Representative CAIAZZO of Scarborough, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On June 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP/OTP-AM
On May 7, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On April 14, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 21-A section 1125, sub-section 12
- Chapter null - 21-A section 1017, sub-section 5
+ − Votes (2)
June 8, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 7, 2021: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 62
- Absent: 10