+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- On further motion of the same Representative, under further suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-51) .
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- On further motion of the same Representative, Committee Amendment "A" (H-51) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED.
- Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-51).
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-51) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-51), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On March 26, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On March 9, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 138 - 22 section 3737, sub-section 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor