+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On March 21, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP
On March 16, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - ONTP
- Work Session Held
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
On June 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Approved
On May 21, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Requested
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
- Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor