+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
- READ ONCE.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-750).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-750) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-750), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 3, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On December 15, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
On June 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Approved
On May 21, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Requested
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
- Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 492 - 30-A section 66-C
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor