+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-96).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-96)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-96) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from the table by the President
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset The Senate INSISTED To REFERENCE to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES In NON-CONCURRENCE
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES
- Taken from the table by the President
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
- Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 133 - 14 section 6322, paragraph 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor