+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (55)
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on FAILING of PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-108)
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To Accept The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) AND Senate Amendment "B" (S-250)
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Subsequently, Representative DILLINGHAM of Oxford WITHDREW her REQUEST for a Roll Call.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 285
- (Yeas 74 - Nays 68 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
- The RESOLUTION was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) was READ.
- Representative DILLINGHAM of Oxford REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED.
- Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) was ADOPTED.
- Senate Amendment "B" (S-250) was READ and FAILED ADOPTION.
- ROLL CALL NO. 286
- (Yeas 60 - Nays 82 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
- Under suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) FAILED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 287
- (Yeas 62 - Nays 81 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot Senate Amendment "B" (S-250) READ and ADOPTED
- Taken from the table by the President
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 330 Yeas 27 - Nays 7 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) READ and ADOPTED
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reports READ.
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 331 Yeas 20 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- Sent down for concurrence
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Representative MATLACK of St. George moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending the motion of Representative MATLACK of St. George to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Later today assigned.
- Unfinished Business
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) and Senate Amendment "B" (S-250)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reports READ
- Unfinished Business
- Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
On May 19, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On May 5, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Reconsidered
On April 12, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
June 15, 2021: Acc Maj OTP as Amended Rep
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 68
- Absent: 9
June 15, 2021: ADOPT SBS-250
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 82
- Absent: 9
June 15, 2021: PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 81
- Absent: 8
June 14, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2021: ADOPT SBS-250
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (4)
Joseph BALDACCI
Type:
Primary Sponsor