+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 594 Yeas 17 - Nays 13 - Excused 4 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
- Reports Read
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 76 - Nays 59 - Absent 13 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 457
- On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On February 16, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP/OTP-AM
On January 20, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
On June 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Approved
On May 21, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Requested
On May 20, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- On motion of Representative TEPLER, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Report of the Chair-Pursuant to Joint Order S.P. 9
- Representative TEPLER from the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Reports a recommendation for a CHANGE OF COMMITEE.
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
- On motion by Senator SANBORN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Reference to Committee.
- Taken from the table by the President
On May 17, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - REFER TO OTHER
- Refer Approved by Chairs/Leads - REFER TO OTHER
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Sanborn of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services, in concurrence.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
- Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- Chapter null - 26 section 565
- Chapter null - 20-A section 6359, sub-section 6
- Chapter null - 20-A section 6358, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 20-A section 6358, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 20-A section 6354, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 5 section 19351
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2022: ACCEPT MAJ ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 4
February 23, 2022: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 59
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor