+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- In accordance with the provisions of Section 21 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-706), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-706) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-706).
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
- Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (26)
- Chapter null - 7 section 3922, sub-section 5
- Chapter null - 7 section 3907, sub-section 8-B
- Chapter null - 7 section 3952
- Chapter null - 7 section 3947, paragraph 1
- Chapter null - 7 section 3907, sub-section 24-B
- Chapter null - 7 section 3907, sub-section 12-D
- Chapter null - 7 section 3907, sub-section 20-A
- Chapter null - 7 section 3942, paragraph 1
- Chapter null - 7 section 3954
- Chapter null - 7 section 3923-A, sub-section 5
- Chapter null - 7 section 3925
- Chapter null - 7 section 3948, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 7 section 3952-A
- Chapter 404 - 7 section 3922, sub-section 5
- Chapter 404 - 7 section 3907, sub-section 8-B
- Chapter 404 - 7 section 3952
- Chapter 404 - 7 section 3947, paragraph 1
- Chapter 404 - 7 section 3907, sub-section 24-B
- Chapter 404 - 7 section 3907, sub-section 12-D
- Chapter 404 - 7 section 3907, sub-section 20-A
- Chapter 404 - 7 section 3942, paragraph 1
- Chapter 404 - 7 section 3954
- Chapter 404 - 7 section 3923-A, sub-section 5
- Chapter 404 - 7 section 3925
- Chapter 404 - 7 section 3948, sub-section 4
- Chapter 404 - 7 section 3952-A
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor