+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 422 Yeas 23 - Nays 12 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Reports READ
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 80 - Nays 63 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 343
- On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Later today assigned.
On June 15, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP/OTP-AM
On June 9, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Reconsidered
On May 20, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Carney of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 17, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 12
June 16, 2021: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 63
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor