+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- FINALLY PASSED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Valentino of York, REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY, in concurrence.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor