+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence
- Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative BAILEY from the Committee on JUDICIARY Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- Chapter null - 33 section 193, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 33 section 193, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 33 section 193, sub-section 2
- Chapter 142 - 33 section 193, sub-section 1
- Chapter 142 - 33 section 193, sub-section 3
- Chapter 142 - 33 section 193, sub-section 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor