+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On September 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-150) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-150).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from the table by the President
- Reports READ
- Senator LANGLEY of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, Roll Call Ordered
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-150)
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Roll Call Number 200 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-150) READ and ADOPTED
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
- Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 31, 2017: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1