+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-164).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-164) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Resolve was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Reports READ
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-164)
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-164) READ and ADOPTED
- Sent down for concurrence
On June 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On April 29, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CURRY of Waldo the Bill was REFFERED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Glenn CURRY
Type:
Primary Sponsor