+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (47)
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- 81 having voted in the affirmative and 56 in the negative, with 13 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
- ROLL CALL NO. 455V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- LD 808 In Senate, August 2, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 24 IN FAVOR and 10 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On August 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence
- Taken from the table by the President
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-241) was READ.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- (Yeas 83 - Nays 67 - Absent 1 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- ROLL CALL NO. 323
- Senate Amendment "A" (S-270) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-241) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-241) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-270) thereto was ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-241) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-270) thereto.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from the table by the President ProTem
- Roll Call Ordered
- On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report
- Taken from the table by the President ProTem
- Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED
- Roll Call Number 302 Yeas 8 - Nays 27 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-241) READ
- On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec Senate Amendment "A" (S-270) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-241) READ and ADOPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-241) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-270) thereto ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-241) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-270) thereto
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report,
- Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Reports READ
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
August 2, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 56
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 13
August 2, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 16, 2017: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 67
- Absent: 1
June 15, 2017: ACCEPT MIN ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 27
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor