+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-38).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-38).
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-38) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 35-A section 1702, sub-section 5
- Chapter 71 - 35-A section 1702, sub-section 5
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor