+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-248) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-248).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-248)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-248) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- Chapter null - 28-A section 1366
- Chapter null - 28-A section 1367
- Chapter null - 28-A section 1368
- Chapter null - 28-A section 1355-A, sub-section 3, paragraph D
- Chapter null - 28-A section 1355-A, sub-section 5, paragraph I
- Chapter null - 28-A section 1355-A, sub-section 4, paragraph D
- Chapter 360 - 28-A section 1366
- Chapter 360 - 28-A section 1367
- Chapter 360 - 28-A section 1368
- Chapter 360 - 28-A section 1355-A, sub-section 3, paragraph D
- Chapter 360 - 28-A section 1355-A, sub-section 5, paragraph I
- Chapter 360 - 28-A section 1355-A, sub-section 4, paragraph D
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor