+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
- Reports Read
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On June 8, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP/OTP-AM
On May 10, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
- Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed.