+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (42)
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Possession of the Senate Upon Conclusion of the 129th Legislature and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- ROLL CALL NO. 152
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-252) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-162) thereto.
- (Yeas 86 - Nays 55 - Absent 7 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-252) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-162) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-252) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-162) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-162) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-252) READ and ADOPTED
- Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Committee Amendment "A" (H-252) was ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED
- Taken from the table by the President
- Sent down for concurrence
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required In NON-CONCURRENCE
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-252) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-252) in concurrence
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- (Yeas 85 - Nays 50 - Absent 13 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 101
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-252) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-252).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2019: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 55
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
May 16, 2019: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 50
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor