+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- ROLL CALL NO. 308V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- 79 having voted in the affirmative and 68 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
On June 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reports READ On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-238) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-238) , in concurrence.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-238).
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-238) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin , REFERRED to the Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development, in concurrence.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
- Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 22, 2015: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 68
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor