+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Senate INSISTED To Acceptance of The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-64)
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report READ and ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Reports Read
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- (Yeas 75 - Nays 69 - Absent 6 - Excused 1)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 47
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-64) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-64).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
- Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 25, 2017: ACC MIN OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor