+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-199).
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 258 Yeas 18 - Nays 16 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Reports Read
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- (Yeas 78 - Nays 67 - Absent 5 - Excused 1)
- ROLL CALL NO. 249
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-199) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-199).
- Sent for concurrence.
- HELD at the Request of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston.
- RELEASED.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative BRYANT of Windham, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Reports READ.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
- Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 8, 2017: ACCEPT MIN ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 1
June 6, 2017: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 67
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5