+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Reports READ
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative MATLACK of St. George, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On May 17, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP/OTP
On April 12, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on March 3, 2021.