+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE
- Subsequently FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-588) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-588) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Reports READ
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- (Yeas 82 - Nays 58 - Absent 11 - Excused 0)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 260
- Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Resolve was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-588) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-588).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 14, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On May 4, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Reconsidered
On April 15, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on March 3, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 14, 2021: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 58
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor