+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Possession of the Senate Upon Conclusion of the 129th Legislature and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 117 Yeas 18 - Nays 13 - Excused 4 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-290) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-290) in concurrence
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-290).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-290) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- (Yeas 88 - Nays 55 - Absent 5 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
- ROLL CALL NO. 109
- On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- Chapter null - 20-A section 15675, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 20-A section 8901, paragraph 1
- Chapter null - 20-A section 15681-A, sub-section 5
- Chapter null - 20-A section 15905, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 20-A section 4254, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 20-A section 15675, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 20-A section 15681-A, sub-section 4-A
- Chapter null - 20-A section 15674, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 20-A section 15681-A, sub-section 6
- Chapter null - 20-A section 15683, sub-section 1, paragraph E
- Chapter null - 20-A section 15681, sub-section 4
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2019: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 4
May 21, 2019: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 55
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor