+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (34)
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- 85 having voted in the affirmative and 59 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
- ROLL CALL NO. 344V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 193 19 Yeas - 15 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
- Taken from the table by the President ProTem
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-237) , in concurrence. Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-237) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Reports READ.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- (Yeas 88 - Nays 55 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 148
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-237).
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-237) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Representative FOWLE of Vassalboro moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock, REFERRED to the Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, in concurrence.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
- Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 22, 2015: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 59
- Absent: 7
June 10, 2015: ENACTMENT
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
June 3, 2015: Acc Maj OTP as Amended Rep
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 55
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor