+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-44).
- READ the Second Time.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-44) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative DION of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-44).
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-44) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- On motion by Senator DUTREMBLE of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-44) Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Jackson of Arostook REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
- Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (46)
- Chapter 133 - 15 section 651, sub-section 16
- Chapter 133 - 15 section 652, sub-section 4
- Chapter 133 - 15 section 2121, sub-section 2
- Chapter 133 - 15 section 3003, sub-section 17
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 2, sub-section 17
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 755, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 755, sub-section 3-A, paragraph D
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1152, sub-section 2, paragraph E
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1152, sub-section 2, paragraph G
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1175, paragraph 1
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1175, sub-section 3, paragraph B
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1202, sub-section 1-B
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1204, sub-section 5
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1208
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1252, sub-section 5-A, paragraph B
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1253, sub-section 3
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1256, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1261, sub-section 1
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1262, sub-section 4
- Chapter 133 - 25 section 2801-B, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter 133 - 26 section 663, sub-section 3, paragraph L
- Chapter 133 - 26 section 962, sub-section 6, paragraph H
- Chapter 133 - 26 section 979-A, sub-section 6, paragraph K
- Chapter 133 - 28-A section 2, sub-section 13-A
- Chapter 133 - 34-A section 1001, sub-section 14
- Chapter 133 - 34-A section 1001, sub-section 15-A
- Chapter 133 - 34-A section 5401
- Chapter 133 - 34-A section 5402, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter 133 - 34-A section 5402, sub-section 2, paragraph B
- Chapter 133 - 34-A section 5402, sub-section 2, paragraph D
- Chapter 133 - 34-A section 5402, sub-section 2, paragraph K
- Chapter 133 - 34-A section 5404
- Chapter 133 - 34-A section 11203, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter 133 - 34-A section 11273, sub-section 3
- Chapter 133 - 34-B section 1220, paragraph 1
- Chapter 133 - 39-A section 102, sub-section 11, paragraph E
- Chapter 133 - 39-A section 203, sub-section 1, paragraph C
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1261
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1262
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1263
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1264
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1265
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1266
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1267
- Chapter 133 - 17-A section 1268
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor