+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (42)
On June 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland moved The Senate ADHERE To The Report B Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Senator STEWART of Aroostook moved The Senate RECEDE and CONCUR
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 393 Yeas 11 - Nays 23 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 FAILED
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On June 20, 2023 in the House:
- Speaker TALBOT ROSS of Portland MOVED to INSIST.
- Representative FAULKINGHAM of Winter Harbor MOVED to RECEDE and CONCUR to ACCEPTANCE of REPORT B Ought Not to Pass .
- Representative FAULKINGHAM of Winter Harbor WITHDREW his motion to RECEDE and CONCUR.
- Subsequently, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-237).
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Subsequently The Senate ADHERED To Accept Report B Ought Not To Pass In NON-CONCURRENCE
On June 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reports Read
- On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Report B Ought Not to Pass ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 375 Yeas 24 - Nays 9 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
- Sent down for concurrence
On June 15, 2023 in the House:
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, on motion of Representative ZEIGLER of Montville, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
- The Resolve was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-237) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-237).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 14, 2023 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Unfinished Business
On June 12, 2023 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 8, 2023 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 7, 2023 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 6, 2023 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 1, 2023 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 30, 2023 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative ZEIGLER of Montville, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Any Report.
- Later today assigned.
- Unfinished Business
On May 25, 2023 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP/OTP-AM
On April 11, 2023 in the joint:
- Work Session Held
- Voted - Divided Report
On March 30, 2023 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
On March 29, 2023 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 15, 2023 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 20, 2023: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
June 16, 2023: ACCEPT REPORT 'B' OUGHT NOT TO PASS
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor