+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 135 - Nays 0 - Absent 16 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 672
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-772) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-772) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-772).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-772).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
- Committee on Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 429 - 24-A section 4311, sub-section 1
+ − Vote
June 19, 2018: Enactment
- Yeas: 135
- Absent: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor