+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-349) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-349) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Roll Call Requested Senator CARPENTER of Aroostook asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion for a Roll Call.
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Taken from the table by the President
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reports READ
- Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in concurrence.
- On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in concurrence.
- Unfinished Business
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-349).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-349) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative DUCHESNE of Hudson, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
- Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 176 - 12 section 11212
- Chapter 176 - 12 section 11212-A
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor