+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-287) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-287), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-287).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES in concurrence
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES.
- Committee on Marine Resources suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (120)
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 12 section 6448, sub-section 5
- Chapter null - 12 section 6302-A, sub-section 3, paragraph A-1
- Chapter null - 12 section 6302-A, sub-section 3, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 12 section 6431-E, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 12 section 6474, sub-section 5
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 1, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-C
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 3-A
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph F
- Chapter null - 12 section 6447, sub-section 7
- Chapter null - 12 section 6473, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph E
- Chapter null - 12 section 6446, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter null - 12 section 6448, sub-section 7-A
- Chapter null - 12 section 6431-G
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph I
- Chapter null - 12 section 6310, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 12 section 6431-E, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 12 section 6455, sub-section 5-A, paragraph C
- Chapter null - 12 section 6408
- Chapter null - 12 section 6482, sub-section 2, paragraph C
- Chapter null - 12 section 6413
- Chapter null - 12 section 6810-A, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph D
- Chapter null - 12 section 6447, sub-section 5-C, paragraph C
- Chapter null - 12 section 6448, sub-section 8
- Chapter null - 12 section 6302-A, sub-section 3, paragraph A-2
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph C
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 5
- Chapter null - 12 section 6482, sub-section 2, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 12 section 6310, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 5-B, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 12 section 6448, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 12 section 6455, sub-section 5-A, paragraph D
- Chapter null - 12 section 6445-A, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 12 section 6431-F, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 12 section 6810-A, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 1, paragraph C
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph H
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 12 section 6810-A, sub-section 7, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 12 section 6449
- Chapter null - 12 section 6455, sub-section 5-A, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph K
- Chapter null - 12 section 6431-A, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 12 section 6455, sub-section 5-A, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 12 section 6447, sub-section 5-C, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 12 section 6310-B
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph G
- Chapter null - 12 section 6431-F, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 12 section 6450
- Chapter null - 12 section 6448, sub-section 1, paragraph C
- Chapter null - 12 section 6851, sub-section 2-A
- Chapter null - 12 section 6448, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph J
- Chapter null - 12 section 6406, sub-section 1, paragraph C
- Chapter null - 12 section 6421, sub-section 3-A, paragraph C
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6448, sub-section 5
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6302-A, sub-section 3, paragraph A-1
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6302-A, sub-section 3, paragraph A
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6431-E, sub-section 3
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 2
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6474, sub-section 5
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 1, paragraph B
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-C
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 3-A
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph F
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6447, sub-section 7
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6473, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph E
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6446, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6448, sub-section 7-A
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6431-G
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph I
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6310, sub-section 1
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6431-E, sub-section 2
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6455, sub-section 5-A, paragraph C
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6408
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6482, sub-section 2, paragraph C
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6413
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6810-A, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph A
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph D
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6447, sub-section 5-C, paragraph C
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6448, sub-section 8
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6302-A, sub-section 3, paragraph A-2
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph C
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 5
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6482, sub-section 2, paragraph B
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6310, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 5-B, paragraph B
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6448, sub-section 3
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6455, sub-section 5-A, paragraph D
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6445-A, sub-section 1
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6431-F, sub-section 1
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6810-A, sub-section 2
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 1, paragraph C
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph H
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph B
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6810-A, sub-section 7, paragraph B
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6449
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6455, sub-section 5-A, paragraph A
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph K
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6431-A, sub-section 1
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6455, sub-section 5-A, paragraph B
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6447, sub-section 5-C, paragraph B
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6310-B
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph G
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6431-F, sub-section 2
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6450
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6448, sub-section 1, paragraph C
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6851, sub-section 2-A
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6448, sub-section 4
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 7-B, paragraph J
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6406, sub-section 1, paragraph C
- Chapter 259 - 12 section 6421, sub-section 3-A, paragraph C