+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-587), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-587) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-587)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence.
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Davis of Piscataquis, REFERRED to the Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife, in concurrence.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
- Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.