+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-60).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-60)
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-60) READ and ADOPTEDASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
- Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter 101 - 22 section 2843, sub-section 3-A
- Chapter 101 - 22 section 2843, sub-section 4
- Chapter 101 - 22 section 2843-A, sub-section 10, paragraph F
- Chapter 101 - 32 section 1405, paragraph 3