+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-113).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-113)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-113) READ and ADOPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Gratwick of Penobscot REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES
- Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 274 - 24-A section 4312, sub-section 7-A
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor