+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-90) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-90).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-90).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 14, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On April 15, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On April 6, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 1, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- Chapter 111 - 7 section 543-A, sub-section 4
- Chapter 111 - 7 section 543-A, sub-section 2
- Chapter 111 - 7 section 543-A, sub-section 1