+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-46).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-46).
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-46) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (18)
- Chapter null - 24-A section 4254, sub-section 2, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 24-A section 2847-N, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 24-A section 2763, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 24-A section 4254, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 24-A section 2763, sub-section 2, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 24-A section 2763, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 24-A section 4254, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 24-A section 2847-N, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 24-A section 2847-N, sub-section 2, paragraph B
- Chapter 86 - 24-A section 4254, sub-section 2, paragraph B
- Chapter 86 - 24-A section 2847-N, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter 86 - 24-A section 2763, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter 86 - 24-A section 4254, sub-section 1
- Chapter 86 - 24-A section 2763, sub-section 2, paragraph B
- Chapter 86 - 24-A section 2763, sub-section 1
- Chapter 86 - 24-A section 4254, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter 86 - 24-A section 2847-N, sub-section 1
- Chapter 86 - 24-A section 2847-N, sub-section 2, paragraph B
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor