+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (38)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- IORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 85 having voted in the affirmative and 57 in the negative, 1 excused, 2 vacant, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
- ROLL CALL NO. 344V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Subsequently LD 553 In Senate, February 6, 2020, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after consideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 and 10, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
- Taken from the table by the President
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Held by Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
- Taken from the table by the President
- Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reports READ
- On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock The Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-318) Report ACCEPTED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 330 Yeas 19 - Nays 15 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-318) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-318)
- Sent down for concurrence
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-318) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-318).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
- Chapter null - 8 section 1104, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 25 section 1542-A, sub-section 3, paragraph R
- Chapter null - 25 section 1542-A, sub-section 1, paragraph R
- Chapter null - 25 section 1542-A, sub-section 3, paragraph S
- Chapter null - 25 section 1542-A, sub-section 1, paragraph Q
- Chapter null - 8 section
- Chapter null - 8 section 1003, sub-section 5
- Chapter null - 25 section 1542-A, sub-section 1, paragraph S
- Chapter null - 25 section 1542-A, sub-section 1, paragraph T
- Chapter null - 25 section 1542-A, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 25 section 1542-A, sub-section 3, paragraph O
- Chapter null - 8 section 1201
- Chapter null - 8 section 1202
+ − Votes (3)
February 11, 2020: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 57
- Absent: 7
February 6, 2020: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 5
June 18, 2019: ACCEPT RPT 'A' OTP-A
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor