+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-97).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-97).
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-97) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter null - 30-A section 4401, sub-section 4, paragraph H-2
- Chapter null - 30-A section 4402, sub-section 6
- Chapter 174 - 30-A section 4401, sub-section 4, paragraph H-2
- Chapter 174 - 30-A section 4402, sub-section 6